Watson, James Thomas (CPSO#: 33468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joesphs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James T. Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watson ( CPSO# 33468 )

Business Address:
The Anesthesia Associates of London
100 Picadilly Street
London ON  N6A 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 672-2130

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982