Webster, Jennifer Dawn (CPSO#: 83121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 1B2
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: (613) 771-1016
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8P 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N1B2
Canada
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: 6137711016
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Webster ( CPSO# 83121 )
Dr. R. Webster ( CPSO# 81304 )

Business Address:
100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 771-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER DAWN WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007