Weersink, Erin Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 95843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health and Performance Centre
John T Powell Building, 2nd floor
University of Guelph
50 Stone Rd West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 767-5011 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 821-4007
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Services
1st Floor, J.T. Powell Building
University of Guelph
50 Stone Rd West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519-821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weersink Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weersink ( CPSO# 95843 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
John T Powell Building
50 Stone Road West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE-MARIE WEERSINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEERSINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013