Weetman, Sara Brooke (CPSO#: 90396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: 6477993973
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weetman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Weetman ( CPSO# 90396 )
Dr. T. Heese ( CPSO# 90073 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA BROOKE WEETMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEETMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2009