Weinstein, Jordan Joseph (CPSO#: 73746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Nephrology
9th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3703
Fax: (416) 867-3709
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weinstein ( CPSO# 73746 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital - Department of Nephrology
61 Queen Street East
Suite 9-130
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN JOSEPH WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003