Weisbrod, Daniel Joshua (CPSO#: 75336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: (416) 292-0331
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M-Wing, 1st Floor
Room M1-302B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: (416) 480-4481
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
Ocular Oncology Service
610 University Ave.
Floor 18, Room 472
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4411
Fax: (416) 946-2189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6118
Fax: (416) 530-6291
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 109
2101 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: (416) 292-0331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 75336 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M1-302B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4762

Business Address:
Suite 109
2101 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 18-472
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4411

Business Address:
301-801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSHUA WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006