Weiss, Israel Dov (CPSO#: 79324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay, ON
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

8920 Woodbine Ave #102
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 305-9484
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dov Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 10 2012


Corporation Name: Dov Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Weiss ( CPSO# 79324 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
102-8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISRAEL DOV WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2009