Welch, Robert James (CPSO#: 69571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Welch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Peterborough Medical Centre 707 Charlotte Street Peterborough, ON K9J 7B3
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Ellyn Braun at the Peterborough Medical Centre for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 12 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018