Weldon, Patrick (CPSO#: 91238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1572
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Weldon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weldon ( CPSO# 91238 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 09 Feb 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK WELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015