Welisch, Eva (CPSO#: 89754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eva Welisch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Welisch ( CPSO# 89754 )

Business Address:
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Eva  Welisch may practise medicine independently in paediatric cardiology,
            only.