Westbrook, Christopher (CPSO#: 89258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5416
Fax: (844) 802-2203
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Westbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WESTBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTBROOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010