Whiting, Natalie Marie (CPSO#: 73222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Turnbull Medical Building
170 Simcoe Street, Suite 203
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 876-4523
Fax: (705) 745-1289
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie M. Whiting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Whiting ( CPSO# 73222 )

Business Address:
Turnbull Medical Building
203 - 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 876-4523

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIE WHITING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 1999 to 07 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1999