Whitsitt, Paul Fredrick (CPSO#: 54298)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Whitsitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Whitsitt has advised the College that patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Oshawa Clinic at (905) 723-8551.
Date Received: 01 Feb 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Fredrick Whitsitt to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Whitsitt engaged in professional misconduct in breaching the terms and/or conditions of his undertaking to the College. Prior to the completion of the investigation, Dr. Whitsitt resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)