Wickens, Brandon Ronald (CPSO#: 90655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6C5
Phone: (905) 371-0990
Fax: (905) 371-0055
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens ( CPSO# 90655 )
Dr. C. Wickens ( CPSO# 90632 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 371-0990

Business Address:
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone Number: (905) 986-3335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON RONALD WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015