Wickens, Courtney Marie (CPSO#: 90632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Randus, Courtney Marie (used until: 22 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Niagara Family Health Ctr
Garden City Family Health Team
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens ( CPSO# 90655 )
Dr. C. Wickens ( CPSO# 90632 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 371-0990

Business Address:
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone Number: (905) 986-3335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY MARIE WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011