Wickett, Megan Lee (CPSO#: 95503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Care
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann St
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: 705 645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G2B8
Canada
Phone: 905-873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

130 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5A 1R9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Wickett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wickett ( CPSO# 95503 )

Business Address:
130 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1R9

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville
Cottage Hospital Site
4 Campbell Drive
PO Box 5003
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Care
50 College Drive
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN LEE WICKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013