Wilansky, Hannah (CPSO#: 58662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 742
118 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 2G4
Phone: (416) 929-6931
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannah Wilansky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH WILANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILANSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987