Wilkins, Kendra Lauren (CPSO#: 95504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
PO Box 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-7525
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kendra Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilkins ( CPSO# 95504 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENDRA LAUREN WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013