Williams, Lara Judith Alexandra (CPSO#: 91501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305-737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1J 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13963
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lara J. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Williams ( CPSO# 91501 )

Business Address:
305 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1J 4E9

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA JUDITH ALEXANDRA WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015