Willms, Larry Albert (CPSO#: 65357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-5160
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mishkeegogamang Health Centre
Mishkeegogamang, ON
Sioux Lookout ON  P0V 2H0
Canada
Phone: (807) 928-2298
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Mishkeegogamang Health Centre
Mishkeegogamang, ON
Sioux Lookout ON  P0V 2H0
Canada
Phone: (807) 928-2298
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koval and Willms Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Willms ( CPSO# 65357 )
Dr. M. Koval ( CPSO# 66548 )

Business Address:
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
P O Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 737-5164

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARRY ALBERT WILLMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Nov 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993