Wilson, James Bernard (CPSO#: 72644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: 6133455645
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 72644 )
Dr. J. Murphy ( CPSO# 71473 )

Business Address:
Queen's University Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES BERNARD WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009