Wilson, Jefferson Roy (CPSO#: 87268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street Room 3-074
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 87268 )

Business Address:
St. Michael`s Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
Room 3-074
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5V 0H7
Phone Number: (416) 864-5920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERSON ROY WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016