Wilson, Paul James (CPSO#: 74749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5039
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 653-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005