Wilson, Tania (CPSO#: 86924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1120
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wilson ( CPSO# 86924 )

Business Address:
268 Maiden Lane
PO Box 1120
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009