Winnicki, Monika (CPSO#: 80860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview North Dermatology Clinic
3292 Bayview Ave.
Suite 205
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-7546
Fax: (416) 221-7546
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA WINNICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINNICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2011