Wise, Mark Robert (CPSO#: 29053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wise ( CPSO# 29053 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services T: 1-888-563-3732
Instructions: Effective February 28, 2018: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact the above.
Date Received: 26 Jan 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT WISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1977