Witt, Samantha Bernice (CPSO#: 94922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Kidz Clinic
Unit 215
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-0304
Fax: (905) 303-3035
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Canada
Phone: 1-877-719-4795
Fax: 905-773-7090
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA BERNICE WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2011 to 04 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014