Wolfe-Wylie, Margaret Catherine (CPSO#: 95725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Sheppard Ave. E.
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-9248
Fax: (416) 519-1130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET CATHERINE WOLFE-WYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFE-WYLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015