Wolfsohn, Allan Lawrence (CPSO#: 61596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
191 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 5H7
Phone: (613) 558-6310
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dynacare Laboratories
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-0200 Ext. 6600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.L. Wolfsohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wolfsohn ( CPSO# 61596 )

Business Address:
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone Number: (613) 729-0200

Business Address:
191 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 5H7
Phone Number: (613) 558-6310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN LAWRENCE WOLFSOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFSOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993