Wong, Alice Cheung-Ngar (CPSO#: 72412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: (905) 726-8332
Fax: (905) 726-9899
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alice C.N. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong ( CPSO# 72412 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 726-8332

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE CHEUNG-NGAR WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002