Wong, Benson Chun To (CPSO#: 95938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Cardiopulmonary / Sleep Services
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000 Ext. 3831
Fax: 613-721-2595
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hawkesbury and District General
Hospital
Cardiology and Pneumology Clinic
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A3G5
Canada
Phone: 1-800-790-8870 Ext. 82500
Fax: 613-636-6175
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

West Ottawa Sleep Centre
303-770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A3Z3
Canada
Phone: 613-722-9900
Fax: 613-722-9100
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benson Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 95938 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Cardiopulmonary / Sleep Services
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Cardiology and Pneumology Clinic
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (800) 790-8870

Business Address:
West Ottawa Sleep Centre
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENSON CHUN TO WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015