Wong, Keith Hoi-Kwun (CPSO#: 91157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3292 Bayview Avenue, Suite 105
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 445-4067
Fax: (416) 445-0206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Hoi-Kwun Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 91157 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 445-4067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH HOI-KWUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012