Wong, Leslie Kin Long (CPSO#: 86592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: (905) 430-4032
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

314-7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: 905-451-2123
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leslie K.L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong ( CPSO# 86592 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Forensic Psych. Division
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE KIN LONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012