Wong, Patrick Yee Hong (CPSO#: 90934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anne Johnston Health Station
2398 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2H4
Phone: 416-486-8666
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
North York ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Y.H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 90934 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK YEE HONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2012