Wong, Simon (CPSO#: 93017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2110
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 93017 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015