Wong, Steven Cheong Wai (CPSO#: 95626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Charlton Building, Room F530
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6146
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Medicine and Seniors Care
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle C. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 95710 )
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 95626 )

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 528-5553

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: S Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 95710 )
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 95626 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN CHEONG WAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016