Wong, Ya Chun Alyssa (CPSO#: 95413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ALTUM Health
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Krembil Discovery Tower - 4th floor
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Queensway Health Centre Urgent Care
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ya Chun Alyssa Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wong ( CPSO# 95413 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YA CHUN ALYSSA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016