Wong, Yat Wing (CPSO#: 83505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Second Floor
3248 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N2L4
Phone: (416) 335-3376
Fax: (416) 335-3375
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9019 Bayview Avenue
Unit 5-6
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yat Wing Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wong ( CPSO# 83505 )

Business Address:
3248 Yonge Street
Second Floor
Toronto ON  M4N 2L4
Phone Number: (416) 335-3376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 24 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAT WING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008