Wright, Alison Frances Catherine (CPSO#: 92840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Wright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wright ( CPSO# 92840 )

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON FRANCES CATHERINE WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012