Wright, Douglas (CPSO#: 88907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building, Rm F506
50 Charlton Ave
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33312
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wright Kenny-Scherber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kenny-Scherber ( CPSO# 88913 )
Dr. D. Wright ( CPSO# 88907 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 741-1191

Business Address:
St. Jospeh's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building, Rm F506
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2013