Wu, Jane Zhen Zhen (CPSO#: 95073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AvantDerm
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A3R6
Phone: (416) 869-3376
Fax: 416-365-7546
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic
181 Bay St, 30th floor
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: (416) 507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bay Dermatology
790 Bay Street, #536
Toronto ON  M5G1N8
Canada
Phone: 4165158808
Fax: 416-515-8805
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wu ( CPSO# 95073 )

Business Address:
Bay Dermatology
536 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 515-8808

Business Address:
AvantDerm
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite G02
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-3996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ZHEN ZHEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016