Wulffhart, Zaev Aaron (CPSO#: 62786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wulffhart and Terespolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Terespolsky ( CPSO# 62787 )
Dr. Z. Wulffhart ( CPSO# 62786 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
175 Galaxy Boulevard
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M9W 0C9

Business Address:
42 Prince Edward Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7G1

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAEV AARON WULFFHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WULFFHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990