Xie, Edward Chengchao (CPSO#: 90728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 3111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward C Xie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Xie ( CPSO# 90728 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
RFE Building
Emergency Department
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD CHENGCHAO XIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2012