Xuan, Andrew Yang (CPSO#: 78021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
212 - 2039 Robertson Road
Bell Mews
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 216-8650
Fax: (613) 216-8651
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-4700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Xuan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Xuan ( CPSO# 78021 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4700

Business Address:
Bell Mews
Suite 212
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 216-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW YANG XUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006