Yang, Jianing (CPSO#: 94814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Medicentre Lasalle
1500 Dollard ave office # 201
Lasalleh8n 1t5
Montreal QC  H3G 1L5
Phone: 514-366-4507
Fax: 514-3666901
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jianing Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury 613-632-4185
Instructions: Please contact Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury for your medical charts
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIANING YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014