Yashpal, Nina (CPSO#: 89128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101-105
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3813
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nina Yashpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yashpal ( CPSO# 89128 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA YASHPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASHPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010