Yau, Brian (CPSO#: 96157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 855-756-3454
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yau and Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zhou ( CPSO# 95134 )
Dr. B. Yau ( CPSO# 96157 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1600

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
102 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016