Yeung, Elaine Tiu (CPSO#: 76398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (647) 349-6889
Fax: (647) 349-6885
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaine Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeung ( CPSO# 76398 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
401 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (647) 349-6889

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE TIU YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005