Yeung, Grace Wing-Yan (CPSO#: 93136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Scarborough, Ontario
M1P 3E2
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: 647-341-0281
Fax: 647-361-0451
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Total Health Specialists Clinic
Suite 2128
28 South Unionville Avenue
Unionville ON  L3R4P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 477-3233
Fax: (905) 477-3933
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Grace Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yeung ( CPSO# 93136 )

Business Address:
401 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 349-7362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE WING-YAN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015