Yew, Dawn Su Ying (CPSO#: 89613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospice of Waterloo
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone: (519) 578-9757 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 578-9750
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dawn Yew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yew ( CPSO# 89613 )

Business Address:
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 578-9757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAWN SU YING YEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012